WAIDLICH v. SAUL

Plaintiff: KIMBERLY S. WAIDLICH
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv01575
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Referring Issues to Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman for a report and recommendation as to their appropriate disposition. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 6/25/2019.(CBU)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order, Plaintiff shall file a brief in support of the complaint. Within twenty-eight (28) days after service of Plaintiff's brief, Defendant shall file a brief in response. Within fourteen (14) days after service of Defendant's opposition brief, Plaintiff will file his/her reply brief, if any. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/19/2019.(JRB)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 TRANSCRIPT of Administrative Record of Social Security Administration, by ANDREW M. SAUL. (Attachments: #1 court transcript index, #2 administrative documents, #3 payment documents, #4 jurisdictional documents part 1, #5 jurisdictional documents part 2, #6 non disability related documents, #7 disability related documents, #8 medical records part 1, #9 medical records part 2, #10 medical records part 3, #11 medical records part 4, #12 medical records part 5, #13 medical records part 6, #14 medical records part 7, #15 medical records part 8, #16 medical records part 9)(Wierenga, Julian)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant NANCY A. BERRYHILL. (Wierenga, Julian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin J. Kosiba on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Sue Waidlich. (Kosiba, Justin)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT --Social Security Appeal against NANCY A. BERRYHILL, filed by Kimberly Sue Waidlich. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5390632) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kosiba, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WAIDLICH v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY S. WAIDLICH
Represented By: Justin J. Kosiba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY A. BERRYHILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?