POPP v. TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.

Plaintiff: TAMMY POPP
Defendant: TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01727
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC..(Cunningham, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/13/2019.(JRB)
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Aston Acquisition Corp. for TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC... (Cunningham, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Cunningham on behalf of Defendant TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Cunningham, Andrew)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan I. Marcus on behalf of Defendant TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Marcus, Morgan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by TAMMY POPP. TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC. served on 5/6/2019. (Philipps, David)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, John Thomas Steinkamp hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pending Cases for John T. Steinkamp) (Steinkamp, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff TAMMY POPP. (Steinkamp, John)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC. (REO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff TAMMY POPP. (Robertson, Angie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff TAMMY POPP. (Philipps, Mary)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff TAMMY POPP. (Philipps, David)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC., filed by TAMMY POPP. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5404403) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPP v. TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY POPP
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRANSWORLD SYSTEMS, INC.
Represented By: Morgan I. Marcus
Represented By: Andrew E. Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?