BIOCONVERGENCE LLC v. ATTARIWALA
Plaintiff: BIOCONVERGENCE, LLC and BIOCONVERGENCE LLC
Defendant: JASPREET ATTARIWALA, SIMRANJIT JOHNNY SINGH, SIMRANJIT J. ATTARIWALA and SIM J. SINGH
Case Number: 1:2019cv01745
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting Defendants' #27 Motion to Seal Docket Number 25. Plaintiff shall file a redacted version of the notice of removal within seven days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/3/2019. (SWM)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Parties appeared by counsel on 7/1/2019, for an Initial Pretrial Conference. Dispositive Motions due by 6/18/2020. Discovery due by 4/17/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2019 03:00 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/3/2019.(SWM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Jefferson, Paul)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC . (Murray, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MARGINAL ENTRY denying w/o prejudice Defendant's #35 Motion to Quash State Court's Bench Warrant. It would appear this motion should first be directed to the state court that issued the order. The motion does not indicated this has occurred. If Defendant later files a renewed motion in this Court, Defendant shall include a brief discussing any authority Defendant believes supports the requested relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/26/2019. (SWM)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MARGINAL ENTRY denying w/o prejudice Defendant's #34 Motion to Vacate State Court's Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order. It would appear this motion should first be directed to the state court that issued the order. The motion does not indicated this has occurred. If Defendant later files a renewed motion in this Court, Defendant shall include a brief discussing any authority Defendant believes supports the requested relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/26/2019. (SWM)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Quash State Court's Bench Warrant, filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jefferson, Paul)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION to Quash State Court's Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order, filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jefferson, Paul)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION to Seal Document #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Murray, Christopher)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Summons Issued as to JASPREET ATTARIWALA, SIMRANJIT JOHNNY SINGH. (CKM)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to Simranjit Johnny Singh. (Murray, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Murray, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall file the proposed Amended Complaint, attached to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend, within 7 days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/17/2019. (SWM)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Defendant's Failure to Oppose, filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC, re #22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Murray, Christopher)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Seal Document #25 SEALED Document (Case Participants - doc) , filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jefferson, Paul)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER #24 APPROVED AND SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/7/2019.(SWM)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 *** SEALED PER ORDER DATED 7/3/2019 *** SEALED Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jaspreet Attariwala)(Jefferson, Paul) Modified on 7/3/2019 (SWM).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order)(Murray, Christopher)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2019 03:00 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/31/2019.(SWM)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Complaint, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Murray, Christopher)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MARGINAL ENTRY granting IN PART #18 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's jurisdictional discovery by May 31, 2019. The deadline for Defendant to amend her jurisdictional allegations is enlarged to June 7, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/21/2019. (MGG)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY in Support of Motion re #18 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) , filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit B - Email, #3 Exhibit C - Order)(Jefferson, Paul)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited) , filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Murray, Christopher)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Discovery (Expedited), filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Defendant's First Interrogatories to Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Proposed Defendant's First Requests for Admissions to Plaintiff, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jefferson, Paul)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Submission of Additional State Court Filings and Transcripts, filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 3.4.19 Hearing)(Murray, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MARGINAL ENTRY re #10 Notice of Pending Motions in State Court Action: This Notice does not comply with Local Rule 81-2(d)(2). Parties have 7 days to comply with this rule and refile only those motions that require a ruling by this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 5/10/2019.(SWM)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Submission of Additional State Court Filings and Transcripts, filed by Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit B - March 1 Transcript of Hearing, #3 Exhibit C - April 17 Transcript of Hearing, #4 Exhibit D - April 18 Transcript of Hearing, #5 Exhibit E - Writ of Attachment, #6 Exhibit F - Findings of Fact, #7 Exhibit G - Filings and Orders after 5.1.19)(Murray, Christopher)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - the Court ORDERS Defendant to file an Amended Notice of Removal within fourteen (14) days of the date of this entry, which addresses the issue outlined in this Order by properly alleging a basis for diversity jurisdiction. (See Order). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 5/9/2019. (MAC)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jody M. Butts on behalf of Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Butts, Jody)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Cynthia A. Bedrick on behalf of Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Bedrick, Cynthia)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Christopher Johnson on behalf of Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Johnson, Erik)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Pending Motions in State Court Action, filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA (Jefferson, Paul)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT to #1 Notice of Removal by JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 Operative Complaint and Exhibits)(Jefferson, Paul) Modified on 5/8/2019 (LDH).
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing in State Court by JASPREET ATTARIWALA (Jefferson, Paul)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan H. Jackson on behalf of Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE, LLC. (Jackson, Susan)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Murray on behalf of Plaintiff BIOCONVERGENCE, LLC. (Murray, Christopher)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBIT to Notice of Removal #1 filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Affidavit (Jefferson, Paul) Modified on 5/8/2019 (LDH).
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul L. Jefferson on behalf of Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Jefferson, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Defendant JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Jefferson, Paul)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe Circuit 1, case number 53C01-1902-PL-000480, filed by JASPREET ATTARIWALA. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5407011) (Jefferson, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BIOCONVERGENCE LLC v. ATTARIWALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASPREET ATTARIWALA
Represented By: Paul L. Jefferson
Represented By: Cynthia A. Bedrick
Represented By: Jody M. Butts
Represented By: Erik Christopher Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMRANJIT JOHNNY SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIMRANJIT J. ATTARIWALA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIM J. SINGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIOCONVERGENCE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BIOCONVERGENCE LLC
Represented By: Christopher C. Murray
Represented By: Susan H. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?