BYRD v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: PARMELLIA BYRD
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01899
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Gerald Blazek on behalf of Plaintiff PARMELLIA BYRD. (Blazek, Keith)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Plaintiff's Response re #1 Notice of Removal by Keith Gerald Blazek on behalf of PARMELLIA BYRD (Blazek, Keith) Modified on 6/4/2019 (CKM).
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Answer to Amended Complaint), filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Drummy, John)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 5/24/2019.(JRB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 Submission of Additional State Court Records Marion County Superior Court 49D05-1812-CT-050785. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CKM)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Removal Notice in the Marion County Superior Court by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court) (Drummy, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Nicole Guthrie on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Guthrie, Jennifer)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John B. Drummy on behalf of Defendant STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Drummy, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Civil Court Five, case number 49D05-1812-CT-050785, filed by STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5424565) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - State Court Record (State Court Docket, Complaint for Damages, Appearance, Summons (Lewis), Summons (Armstrong), Notice of Dismissal and Motion to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant, Order Granting Notice of Dismissal and Motion to Amend Complaint to Substitute Defendant, Amended Complaint for Damages, Summons (State Farm), Appearance, Motion for Initial Enlargement of Time), #2 Appendix B - Demand letter, #3 Appendix C - Amended Complaint for Damages, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drummy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BYRD v. STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John B. Drummy
Represented By: Jennifer Nicole Guthrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PARMELLIA BYRD
Represented By: Keith Gerald Blazek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?