UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $20,000.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $20,000.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 1:2019cv01917
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #4 Order for Warrant for Arrest of Property sent to Greg Jones, 555 Elberon Avenue, Cincinnati, OH 45205. (DWH)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR WARRANT for Arrest of Property - WHEREAS, a Complaint for Forfeiture In Rem has been filed in this Court on May 13, 2019, by Josh J. Minkler, United States Attorney for the Southern District of Indiana, against $20,000.00 In United States Currency, Defendant herein, for reasons and causes set forth in the Complaint; YOU ARE HEREBY COMMANDED to take custody of and to deliver Defendant property into the possession of the United States of America, to be detained in the possession of the United States or its designee until further order of this Court, and you will make return thereon not later than ten days after execution of process. Signed by Clerk on 6/3/2019. Electronic notice to USM-C. Copies Distributed pursuant to Distribution List. (DWH) Modified on 6/4/2019 (DWH).
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Parker Babbs on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Babbs, Eric)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT OF FORFEITURE IN REM against $20,000.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Warrant for Arrest of Property)(Babbs, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. $20,000.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $20,000.00 UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Eric Parker Babbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?