N. et al v. FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: R. N. and R. T.
Defendant: FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION and BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2019cv01922
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by All Defendants.(Wheeler, Thomas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John Terrill Young on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Young, John)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Stewart Johnson on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Johnson, Amy)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger A. Young on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Young, Roger)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Wheeler, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Wheeler, II on behalf of Defendants BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (Wheeler, Thomas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION. (REO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas W. Blessing on behalf of Plaintiffs R. N., R. T.. (Blessing, Thomas)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION, filed by R. N., R. T.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5427192) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Blessing, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N. et al v. FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Roger A. Young
Represented By: Thomas E. Wheeler, II
Represented By: Amy Stewart Johnson
Represented By: John Terrill Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF SCHOOL TRUSTEES OF THE FRANKLIN COMMUNITY SCHOOL CORPORATION
Represented By: Roger A. Young
Represented By: Thomas E. Wheeler, II
Represented By: Amy Stewart Johnson
Represented By: John Terrill Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. N.
Represented By: Thomas W. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. T.
Represented By: Thomas W. Blessing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?