WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY v. EDWARDS et al

Plaintiff: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: MARY K. MAY, RICHARD D. TUDOR and SETH R. EDWARDS
Case Number: 1:2019cv01923
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 23 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by MARY K. MAY.(Oliveira, Anthony)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by RICHARD D. TUDOR.(Delk, Jason)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Continuance. Comes now the Defendant, Seth R. Edwards, by counsel, John H. Brooke, Brooke Stevens, P.C.,and files the Motion to Continue Initial Pre-Trial Conference, which Motion is on file with this Court. And the Court, being duly advised in the premises, now finds that said Motion should be granted. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the July 12, 2019 Initial Pre-Trial Conference is RESET for July 22, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Eastern). All other provisions of the Court's scheduling order [Dkt. 15] remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/5/2019.(NLR)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 First MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pre-Trial Conference, filed by Defendant SETH R. EDWARDS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brooke, John)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Joint CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY . (Vitone, Linda)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time to 7/27/2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant SETH R. EDWARDS. (Brooke, John) Modified on 7/1/2019 (CKM).
June 28, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Brooke on behalf of Defendant SETH R. EDWARDS. (Brooke, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Seth Edwards on 6-8-19, filed by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Vitone, Linda)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/10/2019.(SWM)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. MARY K. MAY served on 5/24/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service - Mary K May)(Vitone, Linda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Submission of Proposed Order Order on First Motion for Extension of Time, re #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/12/2019 to respond to complaint, filed by Defendant MARY K. MAY. (Oliveira, Anthony)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Notice of Parties First Extension of Time to 07/12/2019 to respond to complaint, filed by Defendant MARY K. MAY. (Oliveira, Anthony) Modified on 6/5/2019 (LDH).
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony J. Oliveira on behalf of Defendant MARY K. MAY. (Oliveira, Anthony)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. RICHARD D. TUDOR served on 5/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Certified Mail Return Receipt)(Vitone, Linda)
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to MARY K. MAY. (LDH)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Vitone, Linda)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant RICHARD D. TUDOR. (Delk, Jason)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Delk on behalf of Defendant RICHARD D. TUDOR. (Delk, Jason)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to SETH R. EDWARDS, MARY K. MAY, RICHARD D. TUDOR. (REO)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Vitone, Linda)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda L. Vitone on behalf of Plaintiff WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Vitone, Linda)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against SETH R. EDWARDS, MARY K. MAY, RICHARD D. TUDOR, filed by WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5427275) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Tudor Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - May Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons Seth R. Edwards, #6 Proposed Summons Richard D. Tudor, #7 Proposed Summons Mary K. May)(Vitone, Linda) Modified on 5/14/2019 (REO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY v. EDWARDS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY K. MAY
Represented By: Anthony J. Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD D. TUDOR
Represented By: Jason R. Delk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETH R. EDWARDS
Represented By: John H. Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTFIELD INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Linda L. Vitone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?