SULLIVAN v. OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Plaintiff: KAREN SULLIVAN
Defendant: OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01939
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses, filed by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC..(Seidler, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (Seidler, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (Seidler, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J. Williamson on behalf of Defendant OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (Williamson, Aaron)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F. Seidler on behalf of Defendant OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.. (Seidler, Robert)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KAREN SULLIVAN. OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. served on 5/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Cummings, Paul) Modified on 5/29/2019 - Edited text to reflect type of service(NAD).
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC. (REO)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul J. Cummings on behalf of Plaintiff KAREN SULLIVAN. (Cummings, Paul)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Request for Jury Trial against OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC., filed by KAREN SULLIVAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5428490) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummings, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SULLIVAN v. OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN SULLIVAN
Represented By: Paul J. Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLD DOMINION FREIGHT LINE, INC.
Represented By: Aaron J. Williamson
Represented By: Robert F. Seidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?