PERRONG v. GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Plaintiff: ANDREW PERRONG
Defendant: GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY and AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01940
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227b3
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC. (Gameros, Charles)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC. (LAB) (NAD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 15 Defendant American Select Partners, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC.(Gameros, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge James Patrick Hanlon is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-01940-TWP-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (REO)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 6/19/2019. (PKP)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin L. Hoffman on behalf of Defendant GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hoffman, Erin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dunn, Amy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Grewal Dunn on behalf of Defendant GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Dunn, Amy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Other Associated Documents served on Patrick Jones, CT Corporation, as Registered Agent on May 28, 2019, filed by ANDREW PERRONG. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by ANDREW PERRONG. AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC served on 5/17/2019. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY c/o CT Corporation. (DWH)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC. (REO)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Paronich on behalf of Plaintiff ANDREW PERRONG. (Paronich, Anthony)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC, GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by ANDREW PERRONG. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5428597) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Paronich, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PERRONG v. GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOLDEN RULE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Amy Grewal Dunn
Represented By: Erin L. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN SELECT PARTNERS, LLC
Represented By: Charles W. Gameros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREW PERRONG
Represented By: Anthony Paronich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?