BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. DMAN, INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP., DANDELION MUSIC CO., a division of JAMIE MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC., RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC, COMBINE MUSIC CORP., RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA, GROPER MUSIC; RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC, BARBARA NICKS MUSIC, TREMONTI STAPP MUSIC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC. d/b/a JONDORA MUSIC, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC., UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC, CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC., SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC., GROPER MUSIC, GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC., RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC., RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA and DANDELION MUSIC CO.
Defendant: DMAN, INCORPORATED d/b/a THE GROVE SPORTS BAR & EATERY, DEANN HENSLEY, JAMES D. PETTIGREW and DMAN, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 1:2019cv01958
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights (Attachments: #1 complaint) (JDC) Modified on 6/11/2019 (JDC). (Main Document 7 replaced on 6/11/2019) (JDC).
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to DMAN, INCORPORATED, DEANN HENSLEY, JAMES D. PETTIGREW. (REO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by April Wimberg on behalf of Plaintiffs BARBARA NICKS MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC. d/b/a JONDORA MUSIC, DANDELION MUSIC CO., a division of JAMIE MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., GROPER MUSIC; RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC., TREMONTI STAPP MUSIC, UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP.. (Wimberg, April)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BARBARA NICKS MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC. d/b/a JONDORA MUSIC, DANDELION MUSIC CO., a division of JAMIE MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., GROPER MUSIC; RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC., TREMONTI STAPP MUSIC, UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP. identifying Corporate Parent BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. for BARBARA NICKS MUSIC, BROADCAST MUSIC, INC., COMBINE MUSIC CORP., CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC. d/b/a JONDORA MUSIC, DANDELION MUSIC CO., a division of JAMIE MUSIC PUBLISHING CO., GROPER MUSIC; RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC, RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA, RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC, SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC., TREMONTI STAPP MUSIC, UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP... (Wimberg, April)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5432860) (Attachments: #1 Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Wimberg, April)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC. et al v. DMAN, INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROADCAST MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC, a DIVISION OF MAGNA SOUND CORP.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANDELION MUSIC CO., a division of JAMIE MUSIC PUBLISHING CO.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.; GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC. d/b/a IRVING MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COMBINE MUSIC CORP.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC. d/b/a RESERVOIR 416 a/k/a RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROPER MUSIC; RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA NICKS MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREMONTI STAPP MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC. d/b/a JONDORA MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESERVOIR MEDIA MANAGEMENT INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNIVERSAL-MILLHOUSE MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RHYTHM WRANGLER MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CONCORD MUSIC GROUP, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SONGS OF UNIVERSAL, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROPER MUSIC
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GET LOOSE MUSIC, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONDOR MUSIC INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RESERVOIR ONE AMERICA
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANDELION MUSIC CO.
Represented By: April Wimberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMAN, INCORPORATED d/b/a THE GROVE SPORTS BAR & EATERY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEANN HENSLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES D. PETTIGREW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMAN, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?