REVISION MILITARY. INC. v. AIRSOFT WHOLESALER

Plaintiff: REVISION MILITARY. INC.
Defendant: CHNGEYING CHEN, AIRSOFT WHOLESALER and CHANGQING CHEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01962
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting Defendants' #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 7/26/2019 re #11 MOTION to Remand . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/24/2019. (SWM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to July 26, 2019 re #11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Defendants AIRSOFT WHOLESALER, CHANGQING CHEN, CHNGEYING CHEN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Overhauser, Paul)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff REVISION MILITARY. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Affidavit of Natalie Odle, #2 Exhibit 1-Attachment A, Secretary of State Information, #3 Exhibit 1-Attachment B, Bench Warrant, #4 Exhibit 1-Attachment C, Bench Warrant, #5 Exhibit 1- Attachment D, Certificate of Service of Process, #6 Exhibit 1- Attachment E, Signed Return Receipts, #7 Exhibit 1- Attachment F, Service of Process, #8 Exhibit 1- Attachment G, Service of Process, #9 Exhibit 1- Attachment H, Service of Process, #10 Exhibit 2- Affidavit of Jacob Mendelsohn, #11 Exhibit 2- Attachment A, Complaint)(Betz, Tracy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff REVISION MILITARY. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Remand)(Betz, Tracy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Nicole Betz on behalf of Plaintiff REVISION MILITARY. INC.. (Betz, Tracy)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan G. Polak on behalf of Plaintiff REVISION MILITARY. INC.. (Polak, Jonathan)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jacob Samuel Mendelsohn hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. FOR ALAN KOVALSKY (Mendelsohn, Jacob)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Jacob Samuel Mendelsohn hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Mendelsohn, Jacob)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by REVISION MILITARY. INC.. (Mendelsohn, Jacob)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1) (CKM)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 EXHIBIT re #1 Notice of Removal by AIRSOFT WHOLESALER, CHANGQING CHEN, CHNGEYING CHEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - State Court Record Complaint)(Overhauser, Paul)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B. Overhauser on behalf of Defendants AIRSOFT WHOLESALER, INC., Changqing Chen, Changying Chen. (Overhauser, Paul)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Dearborn County Superior Court 1, case number 15D01-1901-MI-000001, filed by AIRSOFT WHOLESALER, INC., Changying Chen, Changqing Chen. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5433698) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 IN State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overhauser, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REVISION MILITARY. INC. v. AIRSOFT WHOLESALER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REVISION MILITARY. INC.
Represented By: Jacob Mendelsohn
Represented By: Alan Kovalsky
Represented By: Tracy Nicole Betz
Represented By: Jonathan G. Polak
Represented By: Jacob Samuel Mendelsohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHNGEYING CHEN
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIRSOFT WHOLESALER
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHANGQING CHEN
Represented By: Paul B. Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?