STOUGH ASSOCIATES, L.P. v. HAGE

Plaintiff: STOUGH ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Defendant: ADAM DEAN HAGE
Case Number: 1:2019cv01970
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor: The parties appeared by counsel for an Initial Pretrial Conference on July 9, 2019. This matter is CONTINUED to August 5, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss case status. Counsel shall attend the status conference by calling the designated phone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. (CAG)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - The Court ACCEPTS Defendant Adam Hage's jurisdictional statement, dkt. 13, as sufficiently addressing the Court's previous order on jurisdiction, dkt. 7. More than 30 days have passed since the filing of the notice of removal, yet Plaintiff has not moved to remand or filed a response. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to comply with Local Rule 81-1 by August 9, 2019 (SEE ORDER). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/9/2019.(DWH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff STOUGH ASSOCIATES, L.P. . (Long, Stacy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 13 Jurisdictional Statement by ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Calvo, James)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a jurisdictional statement to 7/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/17/2019. (SWM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 2, 2019 , filed by Defendant ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Opposing Counsel)(Calvo, James)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern)before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than 7 days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 6/4/2019.(CBU)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney James W. Calvo for ADAM DEAN HAGE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 5/21/2019 (dist made) (CBU)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - Therefore, the Court ORDERS Mr. Hage to file a jurisdictional statement by June 14, 2019, addressing the issue identified in this order (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 5/21/2019.(DWH)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 Submission of State Court Record from Marion County in case number 49D05-1811-PL-045846. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes (3))(REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Attorney(s) James W. Calvo to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5437028), filed by Defendant ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Certificate of James Calvo, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Flora, Colin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin E. Flora on behalf of Defendant ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Flora, Colin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric S. Pavlack on behalf of Defendant ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Pavlack, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, Civil Division 5, case number 49D05-1811-PL-045846, filed by ADAM DEAN HAGE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5435738) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A. State Court Record (CCS, Complaint, Summons, Appearances, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Proof of Service, Appearance, Petition for Temporary Admission, Motion to Withdraw Appearance, Order Granting Withdrawal), #3 Exhibit B. State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C. Correspondence Regarding Stay, #5 Exhibit D. Remaining Claim Calculation, #6 Exhibit E. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Federal Court)(Pavlack, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STOUGH ASSOCIATES, L.P. v. HAGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STOUGH ASSOCIATES, L.P.
Represented By: Stacy Walton Long
Represented By: Tiaundra Marie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM DEAN HAGE
Represented By: Eric S. Pavlack
Represented By: Colin E. Flora
Represented By: James W. Calvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?