COLE v. MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.

Plaintiff: KRISTIN COLE
Defendant: MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01974
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff KRISTIN COLE . (Wilson, Bradley)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/13/2019.(SWM)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew Christopher Ambrose on behalf of Defendant MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Ambrose, Drew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Wiley on behalf of Defendant MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.. (Wiley, Craig)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by KRISTIN COLE. MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC. served on 5/23/2019. (Haskin, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.. (HET)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley L. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiff KRISTIN COLE. (Wilson, Bradley)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff KRISTIN COLE. (Haskin, John)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC., filed by KRISTIN COLE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5436512) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLE v. MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERRITT CONTRACTING, INC.
Represented By: Craig W. Wiley
Represented By: Drew Christopher Ambrose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTIN COLE
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Bradley L. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?