KRESEL v. WARDEN

Petitioner: ROY KRESEL
Respondent: WARDEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv01976
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 RECEIPT #IP065783 for habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (REO)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Respondent's Notice of 42-day Extension of Deadline to File a Return to Order Show Cause, filed by WARDEN. Return to Order to Show Cause deadline is 8/12/2019. (Cornelius, Katherine)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine A. Cornelius on behalf of Respondent WARDEN. (Cornelius, Katherine)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order on Filing Fee - Petitioner Roy Kresel caused the Miami Correctional Facility to transmit a check paying his $5.00 filing fee, which was received by the clerk on June 6, 2019. Payment of the check has been reversed with a notation that the payor account was "Frozen/Blocked." Thus the filing fee isunpaid. Petitioner shall pay the $5.00 filing fee to the clerk of the district court no later than July 10, 2019. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 6/13/2019.(JRB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 RECEIPT #IP065398 for habeas filing fee in the amount of $5.00, paid by Petitioner. (REO)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Disciplinary) - Roy Kresel's petition for a writ of habeas corpus challenges his disciplinary conviction in disciplinary case number NCF 19-01-0057 on January 10, 2019. The petitioner shall have through June 20, 2019, in which to either pay the $5.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate his financial inability to do so. The custodian of petitioner is directed to answer the allegations of the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and in doing so shall show cause why the relief sought by the petitioner should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 7/1/2019. Copy sent to Petitioner via US Mail. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 5/20/2019.(JRB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by ROY KRESEL. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Disciplinary documents, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KRESEL v. WARDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ROY KRESEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WARDEN
Represented By: Katherine A. Cornelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?