WRIGHT-RICHARDSON v. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.
Plaintiff: DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON
Defendant: EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01980
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC. served on 5/31/2019. (Shea, Richard)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Brian Walterman on behalf of Defendant EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (Walterman, Joseph)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.. (HET)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard John Shea, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Shea, Richard)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC., filed by DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437088) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Debt Collector License Information, #2 Exhibit 2 - The December 13, 2018 Letter Sent by Plaintiff's Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit A - Relevant Pages of Plaintiff's February 25, 2019 TransUnion Credit Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Shea, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WRIGHT-RICHARDSON v. EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEANA WRIGHT-RICHARDSON
Represented By: Richard John Shea, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAGLE ACCOUNTS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Joseph Brian Walterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?