MAYE v. CLAPP et al

Plaintiff: HENRY MAYE
Defendant: AARON CLAPP, THE TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA and TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01986
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/11/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Settlement Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/15/2019.(CBU)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/15/2019.(SWM)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff HENRY MAYE . (Adams, Samuel)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/11/2019 09:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by AARON CLAPP, TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA.(Dilts, Jeremy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Michael Dilts on behalf of Defendants AARON CLAPP, TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA. (Dilts, Jeremy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of Service, filed by HENRY MAYE. TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA served on 5/23/2019. (Haskin, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by HENRY MAYE. AARON CLAPP served on 5/23/2019. (Haskin, John)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AARON CLAPP, TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA. (HET)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Mark Adams on behalf of Plaintiff HENRY MAYE. (Adams, Samuel)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Anthony Logan on behalf of Plaintiff HENRY MAYE. (Logan, Paul)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Haskin on behalf of Plaintiff HENRY MAYE. (Haskin, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by HENRY MAYE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5437858) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAYE v. CLAPP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AARON CLAPP
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Dilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOWN OF JAMESTOWN, INDIANA
Represented By: Jeremy Michael Dilts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HENRY MAYE
Represented By: Samuel Mark Adams
Represented By: John H. Haskin
Represented By: Paul Anthony Logan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?