GARRIGUS v. CODILIS LAW, LLC. et al

Plaintiff: TERRI GARRIGUS and TERRI L. GARRIGUS
Defendant: FAY SERVICING, LLC, CODILIS LAW, LLC, U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC, CODILIS LAW, LLC., LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. and FAY SERVICING, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01999
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #29 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court, sua sponte, hereby enlarges Defendant Land Home's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint, which shall be filed on or before 8/12/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline will be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/18/2019. (CBU)
July 17, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 19, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendant LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmond, Bryan)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ****PLEASE DISREGARD, FILED IN ERROR**ORDER ON JULY 11, 2019, TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE - Parties appeared by counsel July 11, 2019, for a telephonic status conference. Discussion was held regarding discovery, settlement, and related matters. Conference concluded without further order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. (MGG) Modified on 7/17/2019 (MGG).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 03:00 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019.(SWM)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting Defendant Codilis Law, LLC's #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/29/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019. (SWM) Modified on 7/17/2019 (SWM).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before July 25, 2019, Defendants Fay Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank Trust National Association shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/16/2019. (NAD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph D. Kern on behalf of Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Kern, Joseph)
July 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Schultz on behalf of Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Schultz, David)
July 16, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Kalas, Jennifer)
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/29/2019 to respond to Complaint, filed by Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Durianski, Kristin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 25, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Answer or Plead, filed by Defendants FAY SERVICING, LLC., U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noonan, James)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Michael J. Feiwell hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Feiwell, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Bryan Keith Redmond hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Redmond, Bryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Feiwell on behalf of Defendant LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Feiwell, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Redmond, Bryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Redmond, Bryan)
June 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Keith Redmond on behalf of Defendant LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.. (Redmond, Bryan)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Durianski, Kristin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Durianski, Kristin)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Lyn Durianski on behalf of Defendant CODILIS LAW, LLC.. (Durianski, Kristin)
June 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons (Alias - Amended) as to U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (NAD)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cohron, Travis)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying as moot Defendants Fay Servicing, LLC and U.S. Bank Trust National Association's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead. Local Rule 6-1(b) provides for an automatic enlargement of time to respond to a pleading or any written request for discovery or admissions, with the consent of opposing counsel and not to exceed twenty-eight days, by the simple filing of a notice of such enlargement with the Court. S.D. Ind. L.R. 6-1(b). All of those requirements are met in this instance; therefore, no motion is required. The Court will treat Docket No. 7 as Defendants' notice of automatic enlargement of time to respond to Plaintiff's complaint to and including July 11, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/5/2019. (SWM)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 11, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint answer or plead, filed by Defendants FAY SERVICING, LLC., U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Noonan, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by James V. Noonan on behalf of Defendants FAY SERVICING, LLC., U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Noonan, James)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CODILIS LAW, LLC., FAY SERVICING, LLC., LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC., U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Maxwell, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff TERRI GARRIGUS. (Maxwell, Michael)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiff TERRI GARRIGUS. (Cohron, Travis)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by TERRI GARRIGUS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5439686) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - Partial Life of Loan, #4 Exhibit B - Refund Check, #5 Exhibit C - PVDNet Cash Hx, #6 Exhibit D - Nov 2018 Mtg Statement, #7 Exhibit E - Dec 2018 Mtg Statement, #8 Exhibit F - Default Notice, #9 Exhibit G - Jan 2019 Mtg Statement, #10 Exhibit H - Feb 2019 Mtg Statement, #11 Exhibit I - Payment Rejection Letter, #12 Exhibit J - Mar 2019 Mtg Statement, #13 Exhibit K - Land Home RFI No 1, #14 Exhibit L - Land Home RFI No 2, #15 Exhibit M - Land Home RFI No 3, #16 Exhibit N - Land Home RFI No 4, #17 Exhibit O - Land Home NOE No 1, #18 Exhibit P - Fay RFI No 1, #19 Exhibit Q - Fay NOE No 1, #20 Exhibit R - Fay RFI No 2, #21 Exhibit S - Fay NOE No 2, #22 Exhibit T - Fay NOE No 3, #23 Exhibit U - Fay RFI No 3, #24 Exhibit V - Fay NOE No 4, #25 Exhibit W - Fay RFI No. 4, #26 Exhibit X - Fay NOE No 5, #27 Exhibit Y - Fay Ext Request, #28 Exhibit Z - No Date NOE Ext Request, #29 Exhibit AA - 2019-4-12 Fay NOE No 6, #30 Exhibit BB - Blanket Resp 4.23.2019, #31 Exhibit CC - FC Complaint, #32 Exhibit DD - Note and Mortgage)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GARRIGUS v. CODILIS LAW, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODILIS LAW, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: James V. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODILIS LAW, LLC.
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Represented By: Kristin Lyn Durianski
Represented By: Joseph D. Kern
Represented By: David M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAND HOME FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Michael J. Feiwell
Represented By: Bryan Keith Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING, LLC.
Represented By: James V. Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI GARRIGUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI L. GARRIGUS
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: Michael P. Maxwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?