JEAN v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.

Plaintiff: SERAPHIN JEAN
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02005
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Indiana Attorney General, c/o Curtis Hill. (DWH)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC. (DWH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.. (Boyd, Amber)
July 8, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.. (Boyd, Amber)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber K. Boyd on behalf of Plaintiff SERAPHIN JEAN. (Boyd, Amber)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, filed by SERAPHIN JEAN. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5440026) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boyd, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JEAN v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERAPHIN JEAN
Represented By: Amber K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?