CRUM v. SN SERVICING CORPORATION et al

Plaintiff: MICHAEL F CRUM and MICHAEL F. CRUM
Defendant: PLANET HOME LENDING, LLC, SN SERVICING CORPORATION, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, FAY SERVICING, LLC, HOME SERVICING, LLC and FAY SERVICING, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02045
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by SN SERVICING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage)(Paige, Pamela)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant FAY SERVICING, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order on Fay's Unopposed Motion for Eleven-Day Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Waller, John)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendants' #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/17/2019. (SWM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to July 23, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant SN SERVICING CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time)(Paige, Pamela)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant SN SERVICING CORPORATION. (Paige, Pamela)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela A. Paige on behalf of Defendant SN SERVICING CORPORATION. (Paige, Pamela)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant FAY SERVICING, LLC.. (Patton, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by David W. Patton on behalf of Defendant FAY SERVICING, LLC.. (Patton, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Waller on behalf of Defendant FAY SERVICING, LLC.. (Waller, John)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by MICHAEL F. CRUM. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 5/23/2019. (Cohron, Travis)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to FAY SERVICING, LLC., HOME SERVICING, LLC, PLANET HOME LENDING, LLC, SN SERVICING CORPORATION, US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (HET)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Maxwell, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL F CRUM. (Maxwell, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W. Cohron on behalf of Plaintiff MICHAEL F CRUM. (Cohron, Travis)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by MICHAEL F CRUM. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5443684) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #4 Exhibit Loan Mod 2008, #5 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #6 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #7 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #8 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #9 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #10 Exhibit Assignment of Mtg, #11 Exhibit Corrective Assignment of Mtg, #12 Exhibit Fay Life of Loan, #13 Exhibit April 2018 Statement, #14 Exhibit May 2018 Statement, #15 Exhibit RFI No 1 Fay, #16 Exhibit Fay RFI Resp No 1, #17 Exhibit NOE No 1 to Fay, #18 Exhibit Fay NOE No 1 Resp, #19 Exhibit SN RFI No 1, #20 Exhibit SN NOE No 1, #21 Exhibit SN NOE No 2, #22 Exhibit SN NOE No 3, #23 Exhibit SN NOE No 4, #24 Exhibit SN NOE No 5, #25 Exhibit SN Resp to NOE No 3, #26 Exhibit SN Life of Loan, #27 Exhibit SN NOE No 6, #28 Exhibit EQF Disp Letter, #29 Exhibit EQF RI, #30 Exhibit Consent Order, #31 Exhibit Mortgage and Note)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRUM v. SN SERVICING CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLANET HOME LENDING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SN SERVICING CORPORATION
Represented By: Pamela A. Paige
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US BANK TRUST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAY SERVICING, LLC.
Represented By: John D. Waller
Represented By: David W. Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F CRUM
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: Michael P. Maxwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL F. CRUM
Represented By: Travis W. Cohron
Represented By: Michael P. Maxwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?