ABBOTT v. SAUL
Plaintiff: RICHARD B ABBOTT and RICHARD B. ABBOTT
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02056
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW M. SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, C. David Little hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Little, C.)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY - Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, [Filing No. 2], is GRANTED. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a). While in forma pauperis status allows the plaintiff to proceed without pre-payment of the filing fee, the plaintiff remains liable for the full fees. Robbins v. Switzer, 104 F.3d 895, 898 (7th Cir. 1997) (Every in forma pauperis litigant is liable for the filing fee; "all [18 U.S.C.] 1915(a) does for any litigant is excuse the pre-payment of fees") (emphasis in original). The Court does not have the authority to waive the filing fee, and it remains due despite Plaintiff's in forma pauperis status. Fiorito v. Samuels, 2016 WL 3636968, *2 (C.D. Ill. 2016) ("The Court does not have the authority to waive a filing fee"); McDaniel v. Meisner, 2015 WL 4773135, *5 (E.D. Wis. 2015) (same principle). The filing fee for in forma pauperis litigants is $350. See USDC Fee Schedule at https://www.insd.uscourts.gov/fees-financial-information (stating that the $400 filing fee includes a $50 administrative fee, but that the administrative fee "does not apply to...persons granted in forma pauperis status under 28 U.S.C. 1915"). Immediate payment is not required. However, the $350 balance remains owing. Copy to U.S. Attorney via U.S. mail. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 5/28/2019. (JDH)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, C. David Little hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Little, C.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Little on behalf of Plaintiff RICHARD B ABBOTT. (Little, C.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , filed by Plaintiff RICHARD B ABBOTT. (Little, C.)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Disability Benefits against COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by RICHARD B ABBOTT. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Little, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABBOTT v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD B ABBOTT
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD B. ABBOTT
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?