FAULKNER v. REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: JOHN FAULKNER
Defendant: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP, REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC, PYOD, LLC and REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02074
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines and additional information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/15/2019.(SWM)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting Defendants' #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/29/2019. No further enlargement of this deadline is anticipated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/15/2019. (SWM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 29, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendants PYOD, LLC, REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC., RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalas, Jennifer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants PYOD, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP. (Kalas, Jennifer)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendants PYOD, LLC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP. (Kalas, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service, filed by JOHN FAULKNER. REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC. served on 5/28/2019. (Philipps, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by JOHN FAULKNER. RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP served on 5/28/2019. (Philipps, David)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of Service, filed by JOHN FAULKNER. PYOD, LLC served on 5/28/2019. (Philipps, David)
June 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC.. (Kalas, Jennifer)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC.. (Kalas, Jennifer)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PYOD, LLC, REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC., RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP. (HET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven James Halbert on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN FAULKNER. (Halbert, Steven)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN FAULKNER. (Robertson, Angie)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN FAULKNER. (Philipps, Mary)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN FAULKNER. (Philipps, David)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PYOD, LLC, REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC, RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP, filed by JOHN FAULKNER. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5446059) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Group A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit Group B - NNMLS Licensure Info, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letters, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FAULKNER v. REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES, LP
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYOD, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL TIME RESOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN FAULKNER
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Steven James Halbert
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?