FRAZEE v. PREMIERE CREDIT of NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FRAZEE
Defendant: PREMIERE CREDIT of NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02080
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC.(Brackenridge, Dean)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time to Move/Plead to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC, re #1 Complaint. (Brackenridge, Dean) Modified on 6/19/2019 (JDH).
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean R. Brackenridge on behalf of Defendant PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Brackenridge, Dean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service, filed by WILLIAM FRAZEE. PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC served on 5/30/2019. (Philipps, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to PREMIERE CREDIT OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (DJH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM FRAZEE. (Steinkamp, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM FRAZEE. (Robertson, Angie)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM FRAZEE. (Philipps, Mary)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff WILLIAM FRAZEE. (Philipps, David)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PREMIERE CREDIT of NORTH AMERICA, LLC, filed by WILLIAM FRAZEE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5447424) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NNMLS Licensure Info, #3 Exhibit C - Collection Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Collection Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRAZEE v. PREMIERE CREDIT of NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FRAZEE
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PREMIERE CREDIT of NORTH AMERICA, LLC
Represented By: Dean R. Brackenridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?