WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC v. B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC DBA WYLIE'S et al

Plaintiff: WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC
Defendant: STEPHEN B JOHNSON, AMANDA R JOHNSON, B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC DBA WYLIE'S, B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC, STEPHEN B. JOHNSON and AMANDA R. JOHNSON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02110
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting Defendants' #19 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/23/2019. (SWM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to July 22, 2019 in which to #1 Complaint , filed by Defendants B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC, AMANDA R. JOHNSON, STEPHEN B. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Joel)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2019 at 2:30 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. **SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/19/2019.(MGG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC served on 6/9/2019. (Zimmerly, Philip)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension to July 18, 2019 in which to respond to #1 Complaint, filed by Defendants B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC, AMANDA R. JOHNSON, STEPHEN B. JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, Joel) Modified on 6/18/2019 (JDH).
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Kirk LeBlanc on behalf of Defendants B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC, AMANDA R. JOHNSON, STEPHEN B. JOHNSON. (LeBlanc, Joel)
June 5, 2019 Filing 14 Alias Summons Issued as to B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC. (JDH)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC. (Zimmerly, Philip)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. STEPHEN B. JOHNSON served on 6/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Zimmerly, Philip)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. AMANDA R. JOHNSON served on 6/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service)(Zimmerly, Philip)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Screenshot, #3 Exhibit B - 05/16/2019 Letter, #4 Exhibit C - Email exchange) (JDH)
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Philip R. Zimmerly hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Zimmerly, Philip)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Craig Eldon Pinkus hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Pinkus, Craig)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summonses Issued as to B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC, AMANDA R. JOHNSON, and STEPHEN B. JOHNSON. (DJH)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip R. Zimmerly on behalf of Plaintiff WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. (Zimmerly, Philip)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. (Pinkus, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig Eldon Pinkus on behalf of Plaintiff WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. (Pinkus, Craig)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC DBA WYLIE'S, AMANDA R JOHNSON, STEPHEN B JOHNSON, filed by WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5450555) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Screenshot, #2 Exhibit B - 5/16/19 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Email Exchange, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pinkus, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC v. B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC DBA WYLIE'S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN B JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA R JOHNSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC DBA WYLIE'S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B.A.M. SWEETS, LLC
Represented By: Joel Kirk LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN B. JOHNSON
Represented By: Joel Kirk LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMANDA R. JOHNSON
Represented By: Joel Kirk LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WYLIEPALOOZA ICE CREAM EMPORIUM, LLC
Represented By: Craig Eldon Pinkus
Represented By: Philip R. Zimmerly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?