RASNAKE v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ANGELA RASNAKE
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv02257
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case , filed by Defendant THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sonneborn, Amanda)
July 29, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses, filed by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(Sonneborn, Amanda)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint to 7/29/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/23/2019. (JRB)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 7/29/2019 for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, filed by Defendant THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sonneborn, Amanda)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eatern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Sonneborn, Amanda)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent PRUDENTIAL FINANCIAL, INC. for THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.. (Sonneborn, Amanda)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda A. Sonneborn on behalf of Defendant THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Sonneborn, Amanda)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed by ANGELA RASNAKE. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 6/10/2019. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (JRB)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. O'Ryan on behalf of Plaintiff ANGELA RASNAKE. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA, filed by ANGELA RASNAKE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5466619) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RASNAKE v. THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA
Represented By: Amanda A. Sonneborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANGELA RASNAKE
Represented By: Bridget L. O'Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?