UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERRY et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: GLENDA R. PERRY, DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER, G.R. NORTON-PERRY and JAMES L. PERRY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02275
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Defendants James L. Perry and G.R. Norton-Perry's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/20/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/24/2019. (SWM)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2019 03:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019.(SWM)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant Delaware County Treasurer's #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/19/2019. (SWM)
July 19, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 8-20-2019 to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendants GLENDA R. PERRY, JAMES L. PERRY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kerns, Daniel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Garrison Kerns on behalf of Defendants GLENDA R. PERRY, JAMES L. PERRY. (Kerns, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 First MOTION for Extension of Time to 08/14/19 , filed by Defendant DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClellan, Donald)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald K. McClellan on behalf of Defendant DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER. (McClellan, Donald)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Delaware County Treasurer on 7/3/2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Foster, Angela)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re #1 Complaint , AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Glenda Perry and James Perry on 07/02/2019, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Foster, Angela)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela R. Foster on behalf of Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Foster, Angela)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER, GLENDA R. PERRY, and JAMES L. PERRY. (DJH)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER, GLENDA R. PERRY, JAMES L. PERRY, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Foster, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PERRY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GLENDA R. PERRY
Represented By: Daniel Garrison Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER
Represented By: Donald K. McClellan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.R. NORTON-PERRY
Represented By: Daniel Garrison Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES L. PERRY
Represented By: Daniel Garrison Kerns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Angela R. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?