THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: KEVIN L. MOYER, MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C. and NANCY LEMEN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02310
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 MARGINAL ENTRY ON #27 Motion for Extension of Time - Defendant Nancy Lemen isGRANTED an extension of time up to and including August 17, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Crossclaim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/8/2019. (JRB)
August 7, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #22 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim , filed by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Baldwin, Brent)
August 7, 2019 Filing 27 Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Cross Claimant NANCY LEMEN, Defendant NANCY LEMEN, re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim of Defendant Lemen, or MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to ComplaintCrossclaim . (Crossen, Trevor) Modified on 8/8/2019 (JRB).
August 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE to the Court, filed by Defendant KEVIN L. MOYER (Moyer, Kevin) Modified on 8/2/2019 (JRB).
July 18, 2019 Filing 25 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim of Defendant Lemen, or MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to ComplaintCrossclaim , filed by Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Baldwin, Brent)
July 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Crossclaim of Defendant Lemen, or (), MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to ComplaintCrossclaim (), filed by Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Baldwin, Brent)
July 18, 2019 Filing 23 Defendants, Kevin L. Moyer, and Moyer Law Firm, P.C.'s ANSWER to #17 Answer to ComplaintCrossclaim , filed by KEVIN L. MOYER.(Moyer, Kevin)
July 18, 2019 Filing 22 Defendants, Kevin L. Moyer, and Moyer Law Firm, P.C.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint of Declaratory Judgment, First COUNTERCLAIM against THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by KEVIN L. MOYER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moyer, Kevin)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONIC INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 02:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed for counsel to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/9/2019.(JRB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Parties First Automatic Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KEVIN L. MOYER (Moyer, Kevin) Modified on 7/3/2019 (JRB).
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Moyer on behalf of Defendant KEVIN L. MOYER. (Moyer, Kevin)
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin L. Moyer on behalf of Defendant MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C.. (Moyer, Kevin)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 DEFENDANT, Nancy Lemen ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against KEVIN L. MOYER, MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C., filed by NANCY LEMEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Crossen, Trevor)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by M. Brendhan Flynn on behalf of Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Flynn, M.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brent W. Baldwin on behalf of Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Baldwin, Brent)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. KEVIN L. MOYER served on 6/13/2019. (Cox, Dina)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C. served on 6/13/2019. (Cox, Dina)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. NANCY LEMEN served on 6/12/2019. (Cox, Dina)
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor J. Crossen on behalf of Defendant NANCY LEMEN. (Crossen, Trevor)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney M. Brendhan Flynn for THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/12/2019. (JRB)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Brent W. Baldwin for THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 6/12/2019. (JRB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cox, Dina)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NANCY LEMEN, KEVIN L. MOYER, MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C.. (JRB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (LAB) (JRB)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) M. Brendhan Flynn to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5471592), filed by Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Dina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney(s) Brent W. Baldwin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5471556), filed by Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cox, Dina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Dina M. Cox on behalf of Plaintiff THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cox, Dina)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5471497) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Cox, Dina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY v. MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN L. MOYER
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MOYER LAW FIRM, P.C.
Represented By: Kevin L. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NANCY LEMEN
Represented By: Trevor J. Crossen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE BAR PLAN MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Dina M. Cox
Represented By: M. Brendhan Flynn
Represented By: Brent W. Baldwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?