CROUCH et al v. LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ROBERT CROUCH and ANDREA CROUCH
Defendant: LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02327
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Dispositive Motions due by 3/3/2020. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. *SEE ALL DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/22/2019. (GD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/19/2019. Approved Case Management Plan, as amended, to be entered by separate order. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/3/2019 at 10:15 AM (Eastern Time). Settlement Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 1:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #257, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. (GD)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REGARDING PROTECTIVE ORDERS. See Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/22/2019.(SWM)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiffs ANDREA CROUCH, ROBERT CROUCH . (Schultz, Michael)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , filed by LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Giordano, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/19/2019 04:30 PM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") on or before July 17, 2019. Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines (see Order for established deadlines). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 6/19/2019.(SWM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Trimble, John)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Robert Giordano on behalf of Defendant LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Giordano, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Trimble, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John Carl Trimble on behalf of Defendant LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Trimble, John)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hendricks County Superior Court 2, case number 32D02-1905-PL-000058, filed by LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5472542) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civl Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - State Court Records (Docket, Appearance, Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons and Affidavit of Service) of Process)(Trimble, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CROUCH et al v. LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CROUCH
Represented By: Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer
Represented By: Michael L. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA CROUCH
Represented By: Thomas Jackson Bemenderfer
Represented By: Michael L. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIGHTNING ROD MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: John Carl Trimble
Represented By: Michael Robert Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?