DUNCAN et al v. US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST et al
Plaintiff: WILLIE J. DUNCAN and ZEOLA DUNCAN
Defendant: 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A. and US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST
Case Number: 1:2019cv02351
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 FINAL JUDGMENT -The Court hereby enters final judgment in Defendants' favor and against Plaintiffs. This action is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction and terminated. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/17/2019. Copies Mailed(CKM)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - DISMISSING CASE FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; Defendants' motion to dismiss, Dkt. #4 , is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Final judgment will enter by separate document. Fed. R. Civ. P. 58(a). Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/17/2019. Copies Mailed. (CKM)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 Submission of Proposed Order granting the Motion to Dismiss, re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 12(B)(6) AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(b)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DENY REMOVAL, filed by Defendants 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A., US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST. (Kraemer, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 12(B)(6) AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(b)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DENY REMOVAL , filed by Defendants 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A., US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST. (Kraemer, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Luke Kraemer on behalf of Defendants 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A., US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST. (Kraemer, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO 12(B)(6) AND TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO 12(b)(1) OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE DENY REMOVAL, filed by Defendants 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A., US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST. (Kraemer, Andrew)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiffs WILLIE J. DUNCAN, ZEOLA DUNCAN. (MAC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A., US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST, filed by WILLIE J. DUNCAN, ZEOLA DUNCAN. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Exhibits). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DUNCAN et al v. US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015-1 BY U.S. BANK N.A.
Represented By: Andrew Luke Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US. ROF IN 111 LEGAL TITLE TRUST
Represented By: Andrew Luke Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIE J. DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZEOLA DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?