TOOLEY v. KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Defendant: KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02355
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY . (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2019 01:30 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/2/2019.(SWM)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Defendant's #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/28/2019. (SWM)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to August 12, 2019 file responsive pleading to Complaint, filed by Defendant KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harvey, Joel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC. (Harvey, Joel)
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Elias Harvey on behalf of Defendant KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC. (Harvey, Joel)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC served on 6/17/2019. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC. (REO)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric C. Bohnet on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Bohnet, Eric)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman on behalf of Plaintiff DENNIS TOOLEY. (Mussman, Louis Ivan)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC, filed by DENNIS TOOLEY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5476852) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TOOLEY v. KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TOOLEY
Represented By: Louis Ivan Christopher Mussman
Represented By: Eric C. Bohnet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KALPRITT INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: Joel Elias Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?