BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION v. STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC
Plaintiff: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION
Defendant: STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02397
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Doris L Pryor
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CLOSED JUDGMENT. STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER - Plaintiff, the Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection (the "Bureau"), commenced this civil action (the "Action") on June 14, 2019 to obtain relief from Defendant, Student CU Connect CUSO, LLC (the "CUSO"). The Bureau brought its Complaint (the "Complaint") under sections 1031(a), 1036(a), 1054(a), and 1055 of the Consumer Financial Protection Act of 2010 (the "CFPA"), 12 U.S.C. 5531(a), 5536(a), 5564(a), and 5565, alleging violations of section 1036(a)(3) of the CFPA, 12 U.S.C. 5536(a)(3), which prohibits any person from providing substantial assistance to a covered person or service provider engaging in unfair, deceptive, or abusive acts or practices. The Bureau and the CUSO (together, the "Parties") have agreed to settle the Bureau's claims against the CUSO and, by and through their counsel, request that this Court enter this Stipulated Final Judgment and Order (this "Order"). ***SEE ENTRY FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 6/20/2019. (JDC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION , filed by Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Stipulated Final Judgment and Order)(Reischl, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Manuel German Arreaza on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Arreaza, Manuel)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Maureen E. McOwen on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (McOwen, Maureen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alice McKenzie Morical on behalf of Defendant STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC. (Morical, Alice)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Hjalmer Reischl on behalf of Plaintiff BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (Reischl, Jonathan)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC, filed by BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reischl, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION v. STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUREAU OF CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION
Represented By: Manuel German Arreaza
Represented By: Jonathan Hjalmer Reischl
Represented By: Maureen E. McOwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STUDENT CU CONNECT CUSO, LLC
Represented By: Alice McKenzie Morical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?