REAL SILK LOFTS CO-OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. NZARA et al
Plaintiff: REAL SILK LOFTS CO-OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE, TAFADZWA NZARA, LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC and THE UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)
Case Number: 1:2019cv02400
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to the Clerk of the Marion County Court. Copies of case documents and docket enclosed. (CKM)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the Joint Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff, Real Silk Lofts Co-Owners Association, Inc., and Defendant, the United States of America, Internal Revenue Service. The Court, having considered the motion and being duly advised in the premises, now GRANTS #7 it. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is remanded to the Marion Superior Court, Cause No. 49D07-1905-CC-019417. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c), the Clerk is directed to send a certified copy of the remand order to the state court clerk SO ORDERED this 3rd day of July, 2019. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/3/2019. Copies Mailed. (CKM)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Remand to State Court, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Lien Priority, filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Shields, Gina)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Defendant USA's #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 7/16/2019. Copy to Real Silk Lofts Co-Owners Association, Inc. c/o Gregory A. Chandler via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 6/18/2019. (SWM)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to July 16, 2019 in which to #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of Appearance , filed by Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendant UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (Shields, Gina)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion Superior Court, case number 49D07-1905-CC-019417, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record Complaint to Foreclose Lien)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REAL SILK LOFTS CO-OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. v. NZARA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STATE OF INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFADZWA NZARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE UNKNOWN OCCUPANT(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REAL SILK LOFTS CO-OWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Gregory A. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?