DICKERSON et al v. WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC. et al
Plaintiff: BRION DICKERSON and JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON
Defendant: KINEDYNE, LLC, KINEDYNE CORP., KINEDYNE INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC. and ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE
Case Number: 1:2019cv02403
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 23:134
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , filed by ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE, WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC..(Whitten, Christopher)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON JURISDICTION - On June 14, 2019, Plaintiffs filed a complaint alleging that this Court has diversity jurisdiction over the case. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs and Defendant Kinedyne LLC to file a joint jurisdictional statement by August 30, 2019. That statement should identify the citizenship of all of Kinedyne LLC's members and the basis for this Court's jurisdiction (SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION). Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/9/2019.(DWH)
August 7, 2019 Filing 20 MARGINAL ENTRY - The Court acknowledges the Notice of Dismissal, dkt. #15 . This matter is DISMISSED only as to Kinedyne Corp. and Kinedyne International, LLC. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 8/7/2019. (DMW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KINEDYNE, LLC. (Sorrell, Justin)
August 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint , filed by KINEDYNE, LLC.(Sorrell, Justin)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER withdrawing #13 Stipulation of Dismissal and granting #14 Motion to Withdraw document 13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/2/2019. (CBU)
July 30, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption, filed by Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toops, Lynn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON. (Toops, Lynn)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw #13 STIPULATION of Dismissal and to Amend Case Caption, filed by Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON , filed by Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Toops, Lynn)
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 ***WITHDRAWN PER ORDER OF 8/2/2019***STIPULATION of Dismissal and to Amend Case Caption, filed by Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON. (Toops, Lynn) Modified on 8/5/2019 (CBU).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2019 at 3:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/16/2019.(CBU)
July 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant KINEDYNE, LLC. (Sorrell, Justin)
July 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Owen Sorrell on behalf of Defendant KINEDYNE, LLC. (Sorrell, Justin)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE, WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Culp on behalf of Defendants ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE, WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC.. (Culp, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Whitten on behalf of Defendants ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE, WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC.. (Whitten, Christopher)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (JDH)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON.(Toops, Lynn)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A. Toops on behalf of Plaintiffs BRION DICKERSON, JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON. (Toops, Lynn)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5480789) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Toops, Lynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DICKERSON et al v. WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINEDYNE, LLC
Represented By: Justin Owen Sorrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINEDYNE CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KINEDYNE INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM THOMAS TRUCKING, INC.
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALDEN L. MONTOYA-LAFARGUE
Represented By: James L. Culp
Represented By: Christopher R. Whitten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRION DICKERSON
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAHNIRA JONES-DICKERSON
Represented By: Lynn A. Toops
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?