SMITH v. COOK MEDICAL LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sylvia Smith
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC, COOK INCORPORATED and WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Case Number: 1:2019cv02446
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 7/24/2019 associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02437-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02438-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02441-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02443-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02444-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02446-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02449-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02450-RLY-TAB(CKM)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/24/2019. (CKM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Roberts Pierson on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (Pierson, Andrea)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kip S.M. McDonald on behalf of Defendants COOK INCORPORATED, COOK MEDICAL LLC, WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS. (McDonald, Kip)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan L. Shaw on behalf of Plaintiff SYLVIA SMITH. (Shaw, Ethan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-02446-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Original Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Sylvia Smith. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5484255) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shaw, Ethan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. COOK MEDICAL LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sylvia Smith
Represented By: Ethan L. Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Represented By: Andrea Roberts Pierson
Represented By: Kip S.M. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?