LEE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Plaintiff: BARBARA LEE
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED, COOK GROUP INC., WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS, COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED and COOK MEDICAL LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02450
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
2 Judge: Doris L Pryor
3 Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 Remark - Pending Actions SD/IN Transferred as Member Actions to MDL 2570 on 7/24/2019 associated Cases: 1:14-ml-02570-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02437-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02438-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02441-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02443-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02444-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02446-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02447-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02449-RLY-TAB, 1:19-cv-02450-RLY-TAB(CKM)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER ESTABLISHING POLICIES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Richard L. Young on 7/24/2019. (CKM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Reassignment pursuant to General Order dated July 13, 2016 of Case to Judge Richard L. Young and Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson, Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-02450-RLY-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (MAC)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew F. Kirkendall on behalf of Plaintiff BARBARA LEE. (Kirkendall, Andrew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5484439) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirkendall, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LEE v. COOK INCORPORATED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK GROUP INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM COOK EUROPE APS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MEDICAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA LEE
Represented By: Andrew F. Kirkendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?