TAYLOR v. JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Plaintiff: JENADA TAYLOR
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02496
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. . (Foster, Tiaundra)
August 12, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant JP Morgan Chase & Co.'s Affimative Defenses and ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO..(Foster, Tiaundra)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion to Appear Telephonically. Plaintiff's counsel may appear by telephone at the initial pretrial conference. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/8/2019. (SWM)
August 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Telephonically, filed by Plaintiff JENADA TAYLOR. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Boyd, Amber)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 02:00 PM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/12/2019.(SWM)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Martin, Bonnie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Martin, Bonnie)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiaundra Marie Foster on behalf of Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Foster, Tiaundra)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L. Martin on behalf of Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.. (Martin, Bonnie)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge James R. Sweeney II. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-2496-JRS-DML, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/1/2019. (LDH)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JP MORGAN CHASE & CO. (MAC)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JP MORGAN CHASE & CO., filed by JENADA TAYLOR. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5491088) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Boyd, Amber)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR v. JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP MORGAN CHASE & CO.
Represented By: Bonnie L. Martin
Represented By: Tiaundra Marie Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENADA TAYLOR
Represented By: Amber K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?