SHORE v. TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Plaintiff: DANA SHORE
Defendant: TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02516
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/19/2019.(MGG) Modified on 8/19/2019 (MGG).
July 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Miles on behalf of Defendant TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (Miles, Amy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (Williams, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Williams on behalf of Defendant TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (Williams, Thomas)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (LAB) (JDH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD, REFILED AT #10 *** NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (LAB)(JDH). Modified on 7/24/2019 (JDH).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC.(Williams, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by DANA SHORE. TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC served on 7/1/2019. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan William Sullivan on behalf of Plaintiff DANA SHORE. (Sullivan, Ryan)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC. (REO)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dutkanych, III on behalf of Plaintiff DANA SHORE. (Dutkanych, Andrew)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC, filed by DANA SHORE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5492934) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dutkanych, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SHORE v. TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANA SHORE
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Represented By: Ryan William Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRILOGY HEALTH SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Amy L. Miles
Represented By: Thomas M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?