DEATON v. CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY

Plaintiff: JACK DEATON
Defendant: CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02546
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)Counterclaim , filed by JACK DEATON.(Dugan, Julie)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff JACK DEATON . (Dugan, Julie)
July 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM against JACK DEATON, filed by CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY.(Reuhs, Nicholas)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON MOTION TO REPLACE EXHIBITS: This matter is before the Court on the Defendant's unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Replace Exhibits to Notice of Removal [Dkt. #4 ]. The Defendant failed to redact personal information as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(a) from two exhibits it attached to its Notice of Removal. Those documents have since been placed under seal to restrict access to them, and the Defendant now moves to replace them with properly redacted versions. The Defendant's motion is GRANTED to the following extent: Docket 1-3 and Docket 1- 4 shall remain under seal, and the Clerk shall note in the docket text at Docket 1 that redacted versions of those exhibits can be found at Docket 4-1 and Docket 4-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/25/2019. (SWM)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 3:30 PM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Counsel shall attend the conference by calling the designated telephone number, to be provided by the Court via email generated by the Court's ECF system. The parties shall file a proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) no fewer than seven days before the pretrial conference in the format set forth in the model CMP found on the Court's website (www.insd.uscourts.gov). Section III(A) through (E) of the proposed CMP shall include the following deadlines as set forth. *SEE ORDER FOR DEADLINES.* Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 7/9/2019. (GD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gardner, Samuel)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Julie A. Dugan hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Dugan, Julie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Withdraw #1 Notice of Removal and Replace Exhibits To Notice of Removal, filed by Defendant CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order onMotion)(Gardner, Samuel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas B. Reuhs on behalf of Defendant CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Reuhs, Nicholas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel B. Gardner on behalf of Defendant CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Gardner, Samuel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 11, case number 49D11-1905-CT-021441, filed by CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5495528) (Attachments: *** Docket 1-3 and Docket 1-4 SEALED PER ORDER DATED 7/25/2019 (SEE DKT. NUMBER 4-1 and 4-2 for REDACTED VERSION) *** #1 State Court Record Ex. A: Docket, Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B: Complaint, #3 Exhibit C: Examination Under Oath Excerpts, #4 Exhibit D: Deaton Demand Letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Ex. E: Civil Cover Sheet)(Gardner, Samuel) Modified on 6/24/2019 to add restriction to 1-3 and 1-4 per CRD(DMW). Modified on 7/25/2019 (SWM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DEATON v. CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONIFER INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Samuel B. Gardner
Represented By: Nicholas B. Reuhs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACK DEATON
Represented By: Terrence M. Rubino
Represented By: Michael Eugene Polen, Jr.
Represented By: Julie A. Dugan
Represented By: Daniel John Zlatic
Represented By: Andrew Arthur Crosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?