KINNICK v. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Plaintiff: JASON KINNICK
Defendant: MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02563
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , filed by Defendant MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A-Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B -Account Notes)(Moline, Nicholas)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/19/2019.(MGG) Modified on 8/19/2019 (MGG).
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of Service, filed by JASON KINNICK. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC served on 7/8/2019. (Philipps, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Moline, Nicholas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Moline, Nicholas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Moline on behalf of Defendant MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Moline, Nicholas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC. (REO)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by John Thomas Steinkamp on behalf of Plaintiff JASON KINNICK. (Steinkamp, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angie K. Robertson on behalf of Plaintiff JASON KINNICK. (Robertson, Angie)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary E. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff JASON KINNICK. (Philipps, Mary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Philipps on behalf of Plaintiff JASON KINNICK. (Philipps, David)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC, filed by JASON KINNICK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5497300) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Indiana Secretary of State Corporate Information, #2 Exhibit B - NMLS State License Information, #3 Exhibit C - Bankruptcy Schedule E/F, #4 Exhibit D - Bankruptcy 341 Notice, #5 Exhibit E - Collection Letter, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Philipps, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KINNICK v. MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON KINNICK
Represented By: Mary E. Philipps
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: John Thomas Steinkamp
Represented By: Angie K. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MED-1 SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Moline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?