ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC et al v. MORRIS et al

Plaintiff: DEBRA ROSE and ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE INVESTMENTS, OCEANPOINT HOLDINGS, LLC, OCEANPOINTE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, OCEANPOINT PROPERTIES, LLC, OCEANPOINTE INVESTMENTS LTD, BERT WHALEN, OCEANPOINTE PROPERTIES LLC, OCEAN POINTE PROPERTIES, THE WAIRE GROUP, INC., OCEANPOINT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, OCEANPOINT HOLDINGS, CHARLES WATSON, DAVE KOEHN, OCEAN POINT HOLDINGS, OCEANPOINTE HOLDINGS, LINZI DEL CONTE, OCEAN POINTE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, PAM STRICKLAND, OCEAN POINT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, KATE FEDERICO, NICOLE MECKLEY, STEVE ROGERS, OCEAPOINT INVESTMENTS LIMITED, OCEAN POINT PROPERTIES, CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, OCEAN POINTE HOLDINGS and NATALIE BASTIN
Case Number: 1:2019cv02581
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
2 Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial, filed by Plaintiffs DEBRA ROSE, ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint for Damages, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- 3037 Station Street, #3 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint for Damages and Request for Jury Trial)(Dillman, Lisa)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiffs are ordered to file an Amended Complaint no later than August 22, 2019, that sufficiently alleges this Court's subject-matter jurisdiction. ***SEE ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL INFORMATION*** Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/2/2019.(JDC)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-2581-JRS-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerk is directed to reassign case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 7/30/2019. (RSF)
July 1, 2019 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(B), which requires a summons be directed to the defendant. Plaintiff has tendered a summons directed to Oceanpointe Management - which is not named as a defendant in this case. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit a properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to NATALIE BASTIN, BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, LINZI DEL CONTE, KATE FEDERICO, DAVE KOEHN, NICOLE MECKLEY, CLAYTON MORRIS, MORRIS INVEST, LLC, OCEANPOINT HOLDINGS, LLC, OCEANPOINT PROPERTIES, LLC, OCEANPOINTE INVESTMENTS, OCEANPOINTE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC, STEVE ROGERS, PAM STRICKLAND, THE WAIRE GROUP, INC., CHARLES WATSON, BERT WHALEN. (Dillman, Lisa)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC)
June 26, 2019 (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(B), which requires a summons be directed to the defendant. Plaintiff has tendered a summons directed to Oceanpointe Management - which is not named as a defendant in this case. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit a properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jynell D. Berkshire on behalf of Plaintiffs DEBRA ROSE, ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Berkshire, Jynell)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Dillman on behalf of Plaintiffs DEBRA ROSE, ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Dillman, Lisa)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5498209) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A - N. Euclid Property)(Dillman, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC et al v. MORRIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE INVESTMENTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINT HOLDINGS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINT PROPERTIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE INVESTMENTS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BERT WHALEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE PROPERTIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINTE PROPERTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE WAIRE GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINT HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES WATSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVE KOEHN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINT HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEANPOINTE HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINZI DEL CONTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINTE PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM STRICKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINT PROPERTY MANAGEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLUE SKY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATE FEDERICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICOLE MECKLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAPOINT INVESTMENTS LIMITED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINT PROPERTIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLAYTON MORRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORRIS INVEST, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCEAN POINTE HOLDINGS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATALIE BASTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA ROSE
Represented By: Lisa M. Dillman
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSEFERIN INVESTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Lisa M. Dillman
Represented By: Jynell D. Berkshire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?