CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al v. CALDERON et al
Plaintiff: BRYAN ABRAMS and CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Defendant: PYRAMID ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. and MARK CALDERON
Case Number: 1:2019cv02703
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER on Motion to Withdraw: This matter comes before the court on Plaintiffs' Consensual Motion to Withdraw Motions for Both Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (Dkts. #9 , #10 ) and to Vacate Order extending Response deadline (Dkt. 18).The court, having reviewed the Motion, the related filings, and the entry of a preliminary injunction in the related case, Calderon v. Abrams, No. 1:19-cv-02681- JMS-MPB, finds and concludes that cause exists and, therefore, GRANTS the motion (Dkt. #19 ). The Clerk is directed to show Plaintiffs' Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (Dkts. 9, 10) as withdrawn by Plaintiff and the court vacates the Order extending Defendant's Response deadline (Dkt. #18 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/19/2019. (SWM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order, #18 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order on Rule to Show Cause , filed by Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Consensual Motion to Withdraw Motions for Both Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction (Docket Nos. 9, 10) and to Vacate Order extending Response deadline (Docket No. 18))(Ammeen, James)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Defendant Mark Calderon's #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to 9/13/2019 re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order on Rule to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/12/2019. (SWM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to September 13, 2019 re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order on Rule to Show Cause , filed by Defendant MARK CALDERON. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Agreed Motion to Enlarge Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO)(Betz, Tracy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Vivek Randle Hadley on behalf of Defendant MARK CALDERON. (Hadley, Vivek)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 Entry from Status Conference - The parties, by counsel, appeared for a status conference on August 2, 2019, on the record with the magistrate judge. The defendants intend to file a motion to disqualify plaintiffs' counsel. The briefing schedule will be governed by Local Rule 7-1. The request for TRO remains under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. (AKW)
August 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracy Nicole Betz on behalf of Defendant MARK CALDERON. (Betz, Tracy)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/2/2019 10:00 AM (Eastern Time) in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. The court will contact counsel by separate email through the court's electronic filing system with the call-in information to be used to participate in the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/31/2019.(SWM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 11 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order, #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order on Rule to Show Cause (corrects docket entry 9), filed by Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bryan Abrams with Exhibits attached, #2 Affidavit Brian D. Caplan)(Ammeen, James)
July 31, 2019 Filing 10 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 8/19/2019 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Entry of Temporary Restraining Order on Rule to Show Cause, filed by Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Ammeen, James) Modified on 8/20/2019 (SWM).
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 *** WITHDRAWN PER ORDER DATED 8/19/2019 *** MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Bryan Abrams with Exhibits attached, #2 Affidavit Brian D. Caplan)(Ammeen, James) Modified on 8/20/2019 (SWM).
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Liechty, Mark)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (LAB) (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MARK CALDERON, PYRAMID ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC.. (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Ammeen, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Ammeen, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Jordan Liechty on behalf of Plaintiffs BRYAN ABRAMS, CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC. (Liechty, Mark)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5508158) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons)(Liechty, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al v. CALDERON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN ABRAMS
Represented By: James J. Ammeen, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Jordan Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMB ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
Represented By: James J. Ammeen, Jr.
Represented By: Mark Jordan Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PYRAMID ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK CALDERON
Represented By: Tracy Nicole Betz
Represented By: Vivek Randle Hadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?