NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. v. WINCO FIREWORKS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant: CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS, INC. and WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02720
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Matthew P Brookman
Referring Judge: Richard L Young
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time. The time within which Defendants must file their responsive pleadings to the Complaint is extended to, and including, September 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/26/2019. (RSF)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of No Objection re #17 Motion for Extension of Time, filed by Plaintiff NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (Brooke, John) Modified text on 8/26/2019 (TMB).
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC. (de la Torre, Carina)
August 21, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (de la Torre, Carina)
August 20, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP.. (de la Torre, Carina)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to 09/23/2019 to Respond to Complaint, filed by Defendants CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roy, Shima)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 8/7/2019.(JRB)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Shima S. Roy for CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP.,Shima S. Roy for WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC,Shima S. Roy for WINCO FIREWORKS, INC. added. Copy sent to counsel via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/31/2019. (JRB)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney(s) Shima S. Roy to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5552934), filed by Defendants CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certification of Shima S. Roy), #2 Text of Proposed Order)(de la Torre, Carina)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. , RETURN of Service, filed by NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP. served on 7/5/2019; WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC served on 7/5/2019; WINCO FIREWORKS, INC. served on 7/5/2019. (Brooke, John)
July 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (LAB) (JRB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendants CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (de la Torre, Carina)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Carina M. de la Torre on behalf of Defendants CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (de la Torre, Carina)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP., WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC, WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.. (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. (LAB) (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JRB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brooke, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.., Summons Returned Unexecuted by NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. as to NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brooke, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brooke, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Brooke on behalf of Plaintiff NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Brooke, John)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Creative Licensing Center, Winco Fireworks International, LLC, winco fireworks, inc., filed by NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5510040) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Trademark registration, #2 Exhibit Agreement)(Brooke, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC. v. WINCO FIREWORKS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CREATIVE LICENSING CENTER CORP.
Represented By: Shima S. Roy
Represented By: Carina M. de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINCO FIREWORKS, INC.
Represented By: Shima S. Roy
Represented By: Carina M. de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WINCO FIREWORKS INTERNATIONAL, LLC
Represented By: Shima S. Roy
Represented By: Carina M. de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH CENTRAL INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By: John H. Brooke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?