JONES v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: SHERI JONES
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 1:2019cv02734
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Matthew P Brookman
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Bengs, Tina)
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Judge Tanya Walton Pratt. Judge Sarah Evans Barker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:19-cv-2734-TWP-MPB, on all future filings in this matter. (DJH)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 7/18/2019. (LDH)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE - Initial Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) before Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. SEE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew P. Brookman on 7/16/2019.(JRB)
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bengs, Tina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent METLIFE, INC. for METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Bengs, Tina)
July 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tina M. Bengs on behalf of Defendant METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bengs, Tina)
July 5, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (DJH)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander C. Trueblood on behalf of Plaintiff SHERI JONES. (Trueblood, Alexander)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. O'Ryan on behalf of Plaintiff SHERI JONES. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, filed by SHERI JONES. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5512329) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERI JONES
Represented By: Bridget L. O'Ryan
Represented By: Alexander C. Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Tina M. Bengs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?