HARDESTY v. SAUL
Plaintiff: JAMES M. HARDESTY and JAMES MATTHEW HARDESTY
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION and ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02784
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant ANDREW SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of judgment. The cause number of this action shall be amended to reflect the referral of this action to the Magistrate Judge. Please use altered case 1:19-cv-2784-TAB-SEB on all future filings with this court. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 8/29/2019.(CBU)
August 23, 2019 Filing 7 JOINT CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by ANDREW SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Clifford Wierenga on behalf of Defendant ANDREW SAUL. (Wierenga, Julian)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR*** CLOSED DISMISSED (Marginal Notation) - The Court acknowledges the Stipulation of Dismissal, dkt. 36 . The parties, by counsel, stipulate and agree that the foregoing case should be dismissed, with prejudice, the same being fully compromised and settled, costs paid. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 7/31/2019. (DWH) Modified on 7/31/2019 (DWH).
July 9, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to USA - ANDREW SAUL. (DJH)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by C. David Little on behalf of Plaintiff JAMES M. HARDESTY. (Little, C.)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Disability Benefits against COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, filed by JAMES M. HARDESTY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5516575) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 Proposed Summons Regional Chief Counsel, #4 Proposed Summons Assistant U.S. Attorney)(Little, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HARDESTY v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMISSIONER OF THE SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Represented By: Julian Clifford Wierenga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES M. HARDESTY
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES MATTHEW HARDESTY
Represented By: C. David Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?