PAYNE v. CAMPBELL et al
Plaintiff: THELMA PAYNE
Defendant: J. HARMON, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT, SAM ALEXANDER and JAMES E. CAMPBELL
Case Number: 1:2019cv02859
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by J. HARMON, SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT waiver sent on 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by J. HARMON, SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. J. HARMON waiver sent on 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by J. HARMON, SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. SAM ALEXANDER waiver sent on 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by J. HARMON, SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. JAMES E. CAMPBELL waiver sent on 7/30/2019. (Stephenson, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, J. HARMON, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Stephenson, James)
August 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendants SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, J. HARMON, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT. (Stephenson, James)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by THELMA PAYNE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDH)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SAM ALEXANDER, JAMES E. CAMPBELL, J. HARMON, SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT, filed by THELMA PAYNE. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP065824) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Suspension, #2 Exhibit B - Indiana Offical Driver Record, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Mayor Joe Hogsett, #4 Exhibit D - Crash Report)(REO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PAYNE v. CAMPBELL et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. HARMON
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEEDWAY POLICE DEPARTMENT
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAM ALEXANDER
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES E. CAMPBELL
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THELMA PAYNE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?