MT NESS, LLC v. CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC
Plaintiff: MT NESS, LLC
Defendant: CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv03030
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Referring Judge: Doris L Pryor
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 CLOSED DISMISSED - MARGINAL ENTRY - Dismissal without prejudice acknowledged #16 . Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/22/2019.(JDH)
August 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff MT NESS, LLC. (Hayes, Carl)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney C. Larry Carbo, III for CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/7/2019. (CBU)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Julie R. Offerman for CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 8/7/2019. (CBU)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney(s) C. Larry Carbo, III to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5560020), filed by Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of C. Larry Carbo, III in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney(s) Julie R. Offerman to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5559908), filed by Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of Julie R. Offerman in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 9:30 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven (7) days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/30/2019 (dist made)(CBU)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File response to complaint to 8/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 7/24/2019. (SWM)
July 24, 2019 Filing 9 Submission of State Court Record from Marion County in case number 49D11-1906-PL-023635. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to August 23, 2019 to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, filed by Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quigley, Marc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
July 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pending State Court Motions, filed by Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC (Quigley, Marc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Barkimer on behalf of Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Barkimer, William)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc T. Quigley on behalf of Defendant CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Quigley, Marc)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court 11, case number 49D11-1906-PL-023635, filed by CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5538399) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint for Immediate Possession of Real Estate and Ejectment, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Record (State Court Civil Docket Sheet, Complaint for Immediate Possession of Real Estate and Ejectment, Appearance of Carl Hayes, J.R. Beatty, and Kathryn M. Merritt-Thrasher, Summons, Affidavit for Immediate Possession of Real Estate, Order to Show Cause, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Appearance of Marc T. Quigley, Appearance of William J. Barkimer, Motion for Automatic Enlargement of Time), #3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit 4 - Declaration of Elizabeth Melloy, #5 Exhibit 5 - Doc. 010 - Order requiring the parties to file a joint jurisdictional statement (2019-07-12), #6 Exhibit 6 - Doc. 020 - Entry on Jurisdiction (2016-06-20))(Quigley, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MT NESS, LLC v. CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MT NESS, LLC
Represented By: James F. Beatty
Represented By: Carl A. Hayes
Represented By: Kathryn M. Merritt-Thrasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELLULAR SALES OF INDIANA, LLC
Represented By: William J. Barkimer
Represented By: Marc T. Quigley
Represented By: Julie R. Offerman
Represented By: C. Larry Carbo, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?