CLARK v. M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.
Plaintiff: AIMEE CLARK
Defendant: M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03031
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James Patrick Hanlon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 DEFENDANT'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC. . (Hunter, Taylor)
September 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Cherry Malichi hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Active Cases) (Malichi, Cherry)
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Cherry Malichi on behalf of Plaintiff AIMEE CLARK. (Malichi, Cherry)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/23/2019 02:00 PM in room #234, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/29/2019.(SWM)
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial, filed by M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC..(Prather, R.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Anthony Prather on behalf of Defendant M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.. (Prather, R.)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Taylor Hunter on behalf of Defendant M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.. (Hunter, Taylor)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Heather R. Falks withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/9/2019. (SWM)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by AIMEE CLARK. M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC. served on 8/5/2019. (Stewart, Darron)
August 8, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney Appearance , filed by Plaintiff AIMEE CLARK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Falks, Heather)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 TRIAL PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James Patrick Hanlon. (DWH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC. (DJH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darron S. Stewart on behalf of Plaintiff AIMEE CLARK. (Stewart, Darron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Heather R. Falks on behalf of Plaintiff AIMEE CLARK. (Falks, Heather)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC., filed by AIMEE CLARK. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5538915) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Dismissal & Notice of Rights, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Falks, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CLARK v. M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S.D. OF LAWRENCE TOWNSHIP FOUNDATION, INC.
Represented By: Taylor Hunter
Represented By: R. Anthony Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIMEE CLARK
Represented By: Darron S. Stewart
Represented By: Heather R. Falks
Represented By: Cherry Malichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?