WHITE v. YANG
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Defendant: WEI CHAN YANG
Case Number: 1:2019cv03048
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: James R Sweeney
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Case, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff shall have through Monday, August 19, 2019 to file an amended complaint or otherwise show cause why this complaint should not be dis-missed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. In doing so, the plaintiff must clearly identify the federal constitutional or statutory provision giving rise to her claims for purposes of federal question jurisdiction or identify the facts--if they exist--necessary to invoke diversity jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332. Failure to do either of these in the time allotted will result in the dismissal of this action without further notice or opportunity to show cause. (Copy to Plaintiff via U.S. mail) Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 8/1/2019. (JDC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(JDC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WEI CHAN YANG, filed by BRENDA L. WHITE. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. YANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEI CHAN YANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?