WHITE v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE
Case Number: 1:2019cv03050
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Mark J Dinsmore
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 MARGINAL ENTRY - Plaintiff's filing is treated as a voluntary dismissal under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This action is terminated. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/14/2019.(NAD)
August 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Withdraw Matter, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 CONSENT to Jurisdiction to US Magistrate Judge by BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(NAD)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY - GRANTING #2 MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, SCREENING AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. For the reasons stated above, White's Non- Prisoner Request to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying the Filing Fee (Filing No. #2 ) is GRANTED. Having screened the Complaint, the Court finds it is subject to dismissal for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. White is granted leave to file an amended complaint by no later than Friday, August 23, 2019. If no amended complaint is filed by that date, this action will be dismissed for the reasons set forth above. (See Entry.) Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 7/29/2019. (NAD)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff BRENDA L. WHITE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE, filed by BRENDA L. WHITE. (No fee paid with this filing). (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (MAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA L. WHITE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF INSURANCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?