SNI SOLUTIONS, INC. et al v. UNIVAR USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NATURAL ALTERNATIVES, LLC and SNI SOLUTIONS, INC.
Defendant: ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. and UNIVAR USA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03071
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Office: Indianapolis Office
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 67 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. identifying Corporate Parent King Tuesley Enterprises, Inc. for ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC., ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC... (Kelber, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against NATURAL ALTERNATIVES, LLC, SNI SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC..(Kelber, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #53 Amended Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against NATURAL ALTERNATIVES, LLC, SNI SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by UNIVAR USA, INC..(Burke, Sean)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting Michael G. Kelber's #62 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. Copy to James P. Muraff via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/11/2019. (SWM)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #61 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Daniel M. Terhune for ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Daniel M. Terhune register as a user of the court's electronic case filing system by September 25, 2019. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Copy to James P. Muraff and Daniel M. Terhune via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/11/2019. (SWM)
September 10, 2019 Filing 62 MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael G. Kelber to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5621172), filed by Defendant ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of M. Kelber, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 61 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel M. Terhune to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5621143), filed by Defendant ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of D. Terhune, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Riley, James)
September 10, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Riley, Jr on behalf of Defendant ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Riley, James)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Robert J Noe withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/9/2019. (SWM)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting #56 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Appearance. Attorney Jay R Hamilton withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 9/9/2019. (SWM)
September 6, 2019 Filing 57 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Robert J. Noe and Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Robert J. Noe, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hartz, Blake) Modified on 9/10/2019 (JDH).
September 6, 2019 Filing 56 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Jay R. Hamilton and Proposed Order by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Motion to Withdraw Appearance by Jay R. Hamilton, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Hartz, Blake) Modified on 9/9/2019 (JDH).
September 3, 2019 Filing 55 Mail Returned as undeliverable. #49 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice, #50 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice sent to Jay R. Hamilton. (JDH)
August 27, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE of Amended Complaint in lawsuit sent to Director of U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint filed 08/26/2019, #2 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,080,330, #3 Exhibit B - Product Data Sheet, #4 Exhibit C - US TM Reg No. 3,643,035, #5 Exhibit D - US TM Reg No. 3,800,487, #6 Exhibit E - US TM Reg No. 839,411) (JDH)
August 26, 2019 Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 6,080,330, #2 Exhibit B - Product Data Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - US TM Reg No. 3,643,035, #4 Exhibit D - US TM Reg No. 3,800,487, #5 Exhibit E - US TM Reg No. 839,411)(Hartz, Blake)
August 26, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake R. Hartz on behalf of Plaintiffs NATURAL ALTERNATIVES, LLC, SNI SOLUTIONS, INC.. (Hartz, Blake)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #48 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Craig C. Martin for UNIVAR USA, INC. added. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2019. (SWM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #47 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Sara Tonnies Horton for UNIVAR USA, INC. added. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2019. (SWM)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting Matt D. Basil's #46 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of UNIVAR USA, INC. Copies via US Mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/21/2019. (SWM)
August 19, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Attorney(s) Craig C. Martin to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5586084), filed by Defendant UNIVAR USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Craig C. Martin, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION for Attorney(s) Sara T. Horton to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5586063), filed by Defendant UNIVAR USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Sara T. Horton, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Sean)
August 19, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION for Attorney(s) Matt D. Basil to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5585946), filed by Defendant UNIVAR USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certification of Matt D. Basil, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Certificate of Admission to the Bar of Illinois, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Sean)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Defendant Univar USA, Inc.'s #44 Motion to Establish Pleading Amendment and Responsive Pleading Deadlines. The Amended Complaint deadline is August 26, 2019. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due September 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/2/2019. (SWM)
August 1, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION to Establish Pleading Amendment and Responsive Pleading Deadlines, filed by Defendant UNIVAR USA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burke, Sean)
August 1, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNIVAR USA, INC. identifying Corporate Parent Univar, Inc. for UNIVAR USA, INC... (Burke, Sean)
August 1, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean P. Burke on behalf of Defendant UNIVAR USA, INC.. (Burke, Sean)
July 23, 2019 Filing 41 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JDH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 40 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (JDH)
July 23, 2019 Filing 39 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 4:18-cv-04090. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND OPINION denying Defendants' #20 Motion to Dismiss and #22 Motion to Dismiss. The case is transferred to the Southern District of Indiana. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/23/2019. (RK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 37 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) filed by Defendant Univar USA, Inc. (FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. (FDS, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting Defendants' #30 , #31 Motions for Leave to File a Reply. Under the Local Rule 7.1(B)(3) standard, a reply brief is permitted where a party has introduced new and unexpected issues in its response to a motion. See Shefts v. Petrakis, 2011 WL 5930469 (C.D. Ill. 2011), at *8. Plaintiffs introduced new and unexpected issues in their #26 , #28 Responses to Defendants' #20 , #22 Motions to Dismiss. In particular, Plaintiffs introduced information about third parties associated with the Defendants to show that each Defendant has a regular and established place of business in the District. The Clerk is directed to file the Replies [30-1], [31-1] attached to the Defendants' Motions as separate docket entries. A resolution on the Motions to Dismiss will follow in a timely manner. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 06/11/2019. (EP, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on March 14, 2019. Plaintiffs have filed a response to the Court's March 6, 2019 Text Order. They explain that they filed this case in the Rock Island Division of the Central District of Illinois because one of the Plaintiffs is based in Geneseo, which is within the Rock Island Division, and telephone calls regarding the patent infringement occurred there. This is not an appropriate basis for divisional venue. Plaintiffs concede, however, that venue is appropriate in the Peoria Division. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to transfer this case to the Peoria Division. (AK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
March 13, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3), #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue Supplement to Plaintiff's Resistance filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Sara Darrow on March 6, 2019. Local Rule 40.1 identifies the four divisions of the Central District of Illinois. Which division a case should be filed in depends on the county from which the case arises. As part of the statement of jurisdiction, the initial pleadings in each case must state the basis for filing in the division selected. CDIL-LR 40.1(F). Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint contains no allegations regarding their basis for filing this case in the Rock Island Division. See Compl. paras. 10-16. In #27 #29 responding to Defendants' #20 #22 motions to dismiss, which argue that venue is improper in the Central District of Illinois, Plaintiffs have further specified their bases for venue. As neither Defendant is incorporated in Illinois, venue is proper in this District only if Defendants have "committed acts of infringement" and have "regular and established place[s] of business" in the District. 28 U.S.C. 1400(b). Plaintiffs generally allege that Defendants committed acts of infringement in this District, but specifically allege only that Defendants sold infringing products to State Farm Insurance Company's headquarters and McLean County Asphalt Co., Inc., both of which are located in Bloomington (in McLean County). They also allege that Defendants marketed their products at trade shows in Peoria, Illinois (in Peoria County). Plaintiffs also now allege that both Defendants have established places of business in this District, but they allege that Defendant Univar USA, Inc. has places of business in Peoria, Springfield (in Sangamon County), and Decatur (in Macon County), and that Defendant Road Solutions, Inc. has a place of business in Bloomington. There are no allegations that this case arises out of counties in the Rock Island Division. Therefore, Plaintiffs are ordered to provide justification for filing this case in the Rock Island Division by March 13, 2019. If venue is not proper in this division, they are directed to identify in which division venue would be proper. (AK, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 34 Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to File a Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response to Rule 12(B)(3) Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) Modified on 2/19/2019 to reflect caption of document (ED, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
February 19, 2019 Filing 33 Plaintiff's Resistance to Defendant Univar USA, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc. (Noe, Robert) Modified on 2/19/2019 to reflect caption of document (ED, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM in Support re #31 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief filed by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. (Kelber, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 2/26/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief to Plaintff's Resistance to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, to Reply Brief, Declaration in Support of Repy, #3 Affidavit Executed Declaration in Support of Reply)(Kelber, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 2/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Reply Brief, #2 Exhibit 1 to Reply Brief - Declaration)(Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) filed by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER: Entered by Judge Hawley on 12/11/2018. The Court has reviewed the Plaintiffs' Status Report #25 . In light of the representations made therein, the Plaintiffs must file their responses to the Motions to Dismiss #20 , #21 by 1/31/2019. (LN, ilcd) Modified on 12/18/2018 to correct Judge (LN, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Filing 25 STATUS REPORT of Plaintiff by SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #24 Motion to Stay. Case is STAYED. Plaintiffs to file a Status Report by 12/10/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/10/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 24 First MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff SNI Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 10/23/2018 (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) filed by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(B)(3) by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue filed by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. (Kelber, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint for Improper Venue by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 10/15/2018 (Kelber, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jonathan P Froemel terminated as counsel in this case. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/27/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Michael G Kelber on behalf of Road Solutions, Inc. (Kelber, Michael) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James P Muraff on behalf of Road Solutions, Inc. (Muraff, James) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER denying WITHOUT PREJUDICE #16 Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.'s counsel is granted leave to renew their motion upon new counsel entering his or her appearance. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 9/13/2018. (KZ, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
September 12, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 9/26/2018 (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Road Solutions, Inc. answer due 10/1/2018. No further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/29/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 9/11/2018 (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #14 Defendant Univar's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint - (Third Requested Extension). Defendant Univar's answer or other responsive pleading is now due by 10/1/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/23/2018. (KZ, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint - (Third Requested Extension) by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 9/5/2018 (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Univar USA, Inc. Dft Univar's ddl is extended to 9/4/2018 to answer or otherwise plead. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/2/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint - (Second Requested Extension) by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 8/15/2018 (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Road Solutions, Inc. answer ddl is extended to 9/4/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 8/1/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 8/14/2018 (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE Pertaining to Subpoenas (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dft Road Solutions, Inc.'s answer due 7/31/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/17/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Road Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 7/30/2018 (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 16, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Jonathan P Froemel on behalf of Road Solutions, Inc. (Froemel, Jonathan) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 12, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Robert J Noe on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 11, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by SNI Solutions, Inc.. (Noe, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting unopposed #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by Dft Univar USA, Inc. Answer due 8/15/2018. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 7/9/18. (WG, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, / Defendant Univar USA, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint (First Requested Extension) by Defendant Univar USA, Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2018 (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Univar USA, Inc.. (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Matt D Basil on behalf of Univar USA, Inc. (Basil, Matt) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Road Solutions, Inc. and Univar USA, Inc. (Summons sent via conventional mail to Attorney for service). (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]
May 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2835858.), filed by SNI Solutions, Inc., Natural Alternatives, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, Univar, #3 Summons, RSI, #4 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 6,080,330, #5 Exhibit B - Product Data Sheet, #6 Exhibit C - U.S. Trademark 3,643,035, #7 Exhibit D - U.S. Trademark 3,800,487, #8 Exhibit E - U.S. Trademark 0,839,411)(Hamilton, Jay) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 7/23/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SNI SOLUTIONS, INC. et al v. UNIVAR USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROAD SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Michael G. Kelber
Represented By: Jonathan P. Froemel
Represented By: James P Muraff
Represented By: Daniel M. Terhune
Represented By: James W. Riley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNIVAR USA, INC.
Represented By: Matt D. Basil
Represented By: Craig C. Martin
Represented By: Sean P. Burke
Represented By: Sara Tonnies Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATURAL ALTERNATIVES, LLC
Represented By: Jay R Hamilton
Represented By: Robert J Noe
Represented By: Blake R. Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SNI SOLUTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Jay R Hamilton
Represented By: Robert J Noe
Represented By: Blake R. Hartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?