OTTO v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Plaintiff: LAURA OTTO
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv03105
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Tim A Baker
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Filing 16 Witness List , filed by Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, Exhibit List , filed by Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Kalas, Jennifer)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN APPROVED AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 4/3/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/8/2020. TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker (case status and settlement). Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 9/18/2019.(CBU)
September 17, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA identifying Corporate Parent CIGNA CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CONNECTICUT GENERAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent CIGNA HOLDINGS, INC., Corporate Parent CIGNA HOLDING COMPANY for LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.. (Kalas, Jennifer)
September 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LAB) (NAD)
September 16, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Affirmative Defenses, filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA.(Kalas, Jennifer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint Proposed CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Plaintiff LAURA OTTO . (Trueblood, Alexander)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander C. Trueblood on behalf of Plaintiff LAURA OTTO. (Trueblood, Alexander)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 2:00 PM in before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. The parties shall file the proposed CMP no less than three days prior to the pretrial conference. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS**. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 8/19/2019.(MGG)
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Keenan Ryan on behalf of Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Ryan, Daniel)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Kalas, Jennifer)
July 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Jay Kalas on behalf of Defendant LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Kalas, Jennifer)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (DJH)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Bridget L. O'Ryan on behalf of Plaintiff LAURA OTTO. (O'Ryan, Bridget)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, filed by LAURA OTTO. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5545074) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(O'Ryan, Bridget)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OTTO v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA OTTO
Represented By: Bridget L. O'Ryan
Represented By: Alexander C. Trueblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: Jennifer Jay Kalas
Represented By: Daniel Keenan Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?